EP3971536 - ULTRASONIC FLOWMETER WITH VIBRATION-RESISTANT OPERATING MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Longfei Charlotte, 28202 / US | 02 /
SAI, Bin Charlotte, 28202 / US | 03 /
CHEN, MeiFa Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2024/12] |
Former [2022/12] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhouse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21195854.1 | 09.09.2021 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | US202017025877 | 18.09.2020 Original published format: US202017025877 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971536 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3971536 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01H3/06, G01H11/08, G01H13/00, G01F1/667, G01F1/66, G01F15/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
G01F1/662 (EP);
G01F1/666 (US);
G01F1/667 (EP);
G01F15/002 (EP);
G01H3/06 (EP);
G01H11/08 (EP);
G01H13/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | G01F1/66, G01F1/667, G01F15/00, G01H1/00, G05D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLDURCHFLUSSMESSER MIT VIBRATIONSFESTEM BETRIEBSMODUS | [2022/12] | English: | ULTRASONIC FLOWMETER WITH VIBRATION-RESISTANT OPERATING MODE | [2022/12] | French: | DÉBITMÈTRE À ULTRASONS DOTÉ D'UN MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT RÉSISTANT AUX VIBRATIONS | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 05.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005026668 (DANIEL IND INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2020284694 (SCOTT JOHN [AU], et al) |