EP3954346 - SYSTEMS FOR LENTICULAR LASER INCISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2025 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC, SI | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMO Development, LLC 31 Technology Drive Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/07] | For all designated states AMO Development, LLC 1700 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Hong Pleasanton, 94566 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21196071.1 | 25.09.2015 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201462055437P | 25.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462055437 P | US201562183653P | 23.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562183653 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954346 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3954346 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/008 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A61F9/00827 (EP,US);
A61F9/00825 (US);
A61F9/00834 (US);
A61F9/0084 (US);
A61F2009/00844 (US);
A61F2009/0087 (US);
A61F2009/00872 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00887 (US);
A61F2009/00897 (EP,US);
A61F9/00829 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME FÜR LINSENFÖRMIGEN LASEREINSCHNITT | [2022/07] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR LENTICULAR LASER INCISION | [2022/07] | French: | SYSTÈMES POUR INCISION LENTICULAIRE AU LASER | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 12.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15777805.1 / EP3197409 | Divisional application(s) | EP24164551.4 / EP4368157 | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2025/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.03.2024 | BG | 20.03.2024 | CZ | 20.03.2024 | DK | 20.03.2024 | EE | 20.03.2024 | ES | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | IT | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | MC | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | PL | 20.03.2024 | RO | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | SI | 20.03.2024 | SK | 20.03.2024 | SM | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | IS | 20.07.2024 | PT | 22.07.2024 | [2025/22] |
Former [2025/08] | AT | 20.03.2024 | |
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2024 | ||
DK | 20.03.2024 | ||
EE | 20.03.2024 | ||
ES | 20.03.2024 | ||
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
IT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NL | 20.03.2024 | ||
PL | 20.03.2024 | ||
RO | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
SK | 20.03.2024 | ||
SM | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
IS | 20.07.2024 | ||
PT | 22.07.2024 | ||
Former [2025/02] | AT | 20.03.2024 | |
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2024 | ||
EE | 20.03.2024 | ||
ES | 20.03.2024 | ||
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
IT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NL | 20.03.2024 | ||
PL | 20.03.2024 | ||
RO | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
SK | 20.03.2024 | ||
SM | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
IS | 20.07.2024 | ||
PT | 22.07.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | AT | 20.03.2024 | |
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2024 | ||
EE | 20.03.2024 | ||
ES | 20.03.2024 | ||
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NL | 20.03.2024 | ||
PL | 20.03.2024 | ||
RO | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
SK | 20.03.2024 | ||
SM | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
IS | 20.07.2024 | ||
PT | 22.07.2024 | ||
Former [2024/48] | AT | 20.03.2024 | |
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2024 | ||
EE | 20.03.2024 | ||
ES | 20.03.2024 | ||
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NL | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
SM | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
IS | 20.07.2024 | ||
PT | 22.07.2024 | ||
Former [2024/47] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NL | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
SM | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
IS | 20.07.2024 | ||
PT | 22.07.2024 | ||
Former [2024/41] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NL | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004032810 (INTRALASE CORP [US], et al); | [A]DE102006053119 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE]); | [A]US2012310224 (MIYAGI TOMOHIRO [JP]); | [XA]WO2013053366 (WAVELIGHT GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]US2013281992 (SEILER THEO [CH], et al) | by applicant | US4665913 | US4669466 | US4732148 | US4764930 | US4770172 | US4773414 | US5108388 | US5163934 | US5207668 | US5219343 | US5646791 | US5993438 | US6315413 | US8260024 | US8394084 | US8403921 | US8690862 | US8709001 | US20110987069 |