EP3982539 - SWITCHING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [2024/13] |
Former [2022/15] | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cejnar, Pavel 51101 Turnov / CZ | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Jolliffe, Jack Louis Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2024/13] |
Former [2022/15] | Eaton IP Group EMEA c/o Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH Route de la Longeraie 7 1110 Morges / CH | Application number, filing date | 21196425.9 | 13.09.2021 | [2022/15] | Priority number, date | GB20200016017 | 09.10.2020 Original published format: GB 202016017 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982539 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3982539 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/0412, H03K17/72, H03K17/74 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
H03K17/0412 (EP);
H02H3/087 (GB);
H03K17/60 (US);
H03K17/08108 (GB);
H03K17/72 (EP);
H03K17/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHALTANORDNUNG | [2022/15] | English: | SWITCHING ARRANGEMENT | [2022/15] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE COMMUTATION | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 26.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5793586 (ROCKOT JOSEPH H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 63; figure 3 * [A] 5-8 [I] 3; | [IA]EP3236572 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [I] 1-4,9 * figure 3 *[A] 5-8 | by applicant | WO2015028634 |