blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3974391

EP3974391 - CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.02.2022
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SK On Co., Ltd.
51, Jong-ro
Jongno-gu
Seoul 03161 / KR
[2023/07]
Former [2022/13]For all designated states
SK Innovation Co., Ltd.
(Seorin-dong)
26, Jong-ro
Jongno-gu
Seoul 03188 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Sang Bok
34124 Daejeon / KR
02 / KIM, Jik Soo
34124 Daejeon / KR
03 / YOON, Jeong Bae
34124 Daejeon / KR
04 / LEE, Seung Ok
34124 Daejeon / KR
05 / CHOI, Ji Hoon
34124 Daejeon / KR
 [2022/13]
Representative(s)Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
[2022/13]
Application number, filing date21196694.014.09.2021
[2022/13]
Priority number, dateKR2020012416124.09.2020         Original published format: KR 20200124161
[2022/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3974391
Date:30.03.2022
Language:EN
[2022/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2022
ClassificationIPC:C01G53/00, H01M4/00
[2022/13]
CPC:
C01G53/50 (EP,KR); C01G53/42 (KR); H01M4/362 (CN);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,US); H01M10/052 (KR); H01M4/0471 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP); H01M4/32 (EP); H01M4/382 (US);
H01M4/505 (KR); H01M4/525 (KR,US); C01P2002/60 (KR);
C01P2002/70 (KR); C01P2002/72 (EP); C01P2002/78 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (EP); C01P2006/80 (KR); H01M2004/028 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATHODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2022/13]
English:CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2022/13]
French:MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2022/13]
Examination procedure14.09.2021Examination requested  [2022/13]
30.09.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2023Observations by third parties
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US7556889  (KUMEUCHI TOMOKAZU [JP], et al);
 [XY]CN101510603  (JILIN JIEN NICKEL INDUSTRY CO [CN]);
 [XY]CN102476833B  (UNIV SOOCHOW, et al);
 [XY]CN107302087B  ;
 [XY]CN111646523  (SVOLT ENERGY TECH CO LTD)
by applicantKR100548988B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.