EP3974636 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BI-FUELLED POWER SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND ASSOCIATED PROCESSING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW H POWERTRAIN HOLDING, S.L.U. Avenida de Madrid número 72 47008 Valladolid / ES | [2024/10] |
Former [2022/30] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUNETOU, Christophe 91510 LARDY / FR | 02 /
SANCHES, Laurent 45480 CHAUSSY / FR | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. API : TCR GRA 2 36 1, Avenue du Golf 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21196808.6 | 15.09.2021 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | FR20200009671 | 23.09.2020 Original published format: FR 2009671 | [2022/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974636 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F02D19/06, F02D19/08, // F02D41/14 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
F02D19/0692 (EP);
F02D19/0647 (EP);
F02D19/0689 (EP);
F02D19/081 (EP);
F02D2200/021 (EP);
F02D2200/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN EINES EINSPEISUNGSSYSTEMS MIT ZWEI KRAFTSTOFFEN FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERARBEITUNGSEINHEIT | [2022/13] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A BI-FUELLED POWER SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND ASSOCIATED PROCESSING UNIT | [2022/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION À BICARBURATION POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET UNITÉ DE TRAITEMENT ASSOCIÉE | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 06.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, LT, IT, IS | 26.10.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012174891 (MARRIOTT CRAIG D [US], et al) [I] 1,10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0031] *; | [XY]WO2013185234 (WESTPORT POWER INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0024] - [0031]; figures 1,10,11 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]DE102012221046 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2-5* paragraphs [0025] - [0042]; figures 1-3b *; | [I]US9453474 (KRAMER ULRICH [DE], et al) [I] 1,10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0045] , [0046]; figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]US2019107074 (MORRIS NATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1,8,10 * paragraphs [0027] - [0032] - [0050] , [0051] , [0063] - [0073] - [0089] - [0092]; figures 1,3 * [Y] 2-5 [I] 6,7 | by applicant | US2009292443 | KR20170124358 |