EP3971599 - METHOD FOR DETECTING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC SIGNAL OF INTEREST AND FOR ESTIMATING ITS DIRECTION OF ARRIVAL IN A WIDE BAND INTERFEROMETRIC GONIOMETER WITH SUB-SAMPLED DIGITAL RECEPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles - Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE MEUR, Anne 78851 ELANCOURT CEDEX / FR | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 21197103.1 | 16.09.2021 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | FR20200009413 | 17.09.2020 Original published format: FR 2009413 | [2022/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971599 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/04, G01S3/46, G01S3/74, H01Q21/06, H04B1/00 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G01S3/46 (EP);
G01S3/043 (EP);
G01S3/74 (EP);
H01Q21/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG EINES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN SIGNALS VON INTERESSE UND ZUR SCHÄTZUNG SEINER ANKUNFTSRICHTUNG IN EINEM INTERFEROMETRISCHEN BREITBAND-GONIOMETER MIT UNTERABGETASTETEM DIGITALEM EMPFANG | [2022/12] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC SIGNAL OF INTEREST AND FOR ESTIMATING ITS DIRECTION OF ARRIVAL IN A WIDE BAND INTERFEROMETRIC GONIOMETER WITH SUB-SAMPLED DIGITAL RECEPTION | [2022/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN SIGNAL ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE D'INTÉRÊT ET D'ESTIMATION DE SA DIRECTION D'ARRIVÉE DANS UN GONIOMÈTRE INTERFÉROMÉTRIQUE LARGE BANDE À RÉCEPTION NUMÉRIQUE SOUS-ÉCHANTILLONNÉE | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 25.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR3020157 (THALES SA [FR]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US2018083816 (BOLSTAD ANDREW K [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0048] - [0056]; figures 1A-1B *; | [A]EP3671250 (THALES SA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0049] - [0050]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0069] , [ 0081] * |