EP4151966 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECORDING SPECTRALLY RESOLVED IMAGES OF A SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leibniz-Institut für Astrophysik Potsdam (AIP) An der Sternwarte 16 14482 Potsdam, Brandenburg / DE | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmälzlin, Elmar, Dr. 14482 Potsdam / DE | 02 /
Korinth, Florian, Dr. 13359 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Roth, Martin, Prof. Dr. 14547 Beelitz / DE | 04 /
Gao, Lu 14480 Potsdam / DE | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Heinemeyer, Karsten Advlnno Patent-u. Rechtsanwaltspart. mbB Heinemeyer & Joachim Sandstrasse 17-23 23552 Lübeck / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21197832.5 | 20.09.2021 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151966 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/44, G01J3/02, G02B21/08, G01J3/28, G01J3/10 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
G01J3/2823 (EP);
G01J3/0218 (EP);
G01J3/44 (EP);
G02B21/08 (EP);
G01J2003/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFNAHME VON SPEKTRAL AUFGELÖSTEN BILDERN EINER PROBE | [2023/12] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECORDING SPECTRALLY RESOLVED IMAGES OF A SAMPLE | [2023/12] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT D'IMAGES À RÉSOLUTION SPECTRALE D'UN ÉCHANTILLON | [2023/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 20.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011081111 (LI QINGXIONG [US], et al); | [XI]EP3136086 (OTSUKA DENSHI KK [JP]); | [A]WO2017171961 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) |