EP3974619 - TURBINE BLADE AND GAS TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/13] | TURBINE BLADE | ||
[2023/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doosan Enerbility Co., Ltd. 22, Doosanvolvo-ro Seongsan-gu Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 51711 / KR | [2022/40] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states Doosan Heavy Industries & Construction Co., Ltd. 22, Doosan volvo-ro Seongsan-gu Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do 51711 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kwang Il 55123 Jeonju-si, Jeollabuk-do / KR | 02 /
SONG, Jin Woo 51563 Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 03 /
HOFMANN, Willy 51711 Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 04 /
BRANDL, Herbert 51711 Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21197961.2 | 21.09.2021 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | KR20200125082 | 25.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200125082 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974619 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3974619 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/20 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
F01D5/20 (EP);
F01D5/186 (KR,US);
F01D5/187 (US);
F02C7/18 (KR);
F05D2220/32 (KR);
F05D2240/305 (EP,US);
F05D2240/307 (EP);
F05D2240/81 (US);
F05D2250/314 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TURBINENLAUFSCHAUFEL UND GASTURBINE | [2023/25] | English: | TURBINE BLADE AND GAS TURBINE | [2023/25] | French: | AUBE ROTORIQUE DE TURBINE ET TURBINE À GAZ | [2023/25] |
Former [2022/13] | TURBINENLAUFSCHAUFEL | ||
Former [2022/13] | TURBINE BLADE | ||
Former [2022/13] | AUBE ROTORIQUE DE TURBINE | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 03.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3199763 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | Examination | US2017159451 | WO2018004766 | WO2018063353 | EP3473808 | by applicant | KR20200125082 |