EP4151983 - INERTIAL PARTICLE IMPACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saxocon A/S Bredevej 2D 2830 Virum / DK | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLING, Kirsten Inga 2970 Hoersholm / DK | 02 /
FRIIS-MIKKELSEN 2830 Virum / DK | [2024/34] |
Former [2023/12] | 01 /
KLING, Kirsten Inga 2970 Hoersholm / DK | ||
02 /
FRIIS-MIKKELSEn 2830 Virum / DK | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21198077.6 | 21.09.2021 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151983 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/02, G01N15/14, B01D45/08, G01N1/22, // G01N15/00 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
G01N15/0255 (EP);
G01N1/2208 (EP);
G01N15/0205 (EP);
G01N15/1433 (EP);
B01D45/08 (EP);
G01N2001/2223 (EP);
G01N2015/0026 (EP);
G01N2015/0038 (EP);
G01N2015/0046 (EP);
G01N2015/0261 (EP);
G01N2015/0288 (EP);
G01N2015/1493 (EP);
G01N2015/1497 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGHEITSPARTIKELIMPAKTOR | [2023/12] | English: | INERTIAL PARTICLE IMPACTOR | [2023/12] | French: | IMPACTEUR DE PARTICULES INERTIEL | [2023/12] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 07.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 16.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4590792 (CHIANG WILLIAM W [US]); | [Y]WO9926464 (PACIFIC SIERRA RESEARCH CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US9885640 (KETCHAM CLIFF [US], et al) | by applicant | EP3403065 |