Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
19.07.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
12.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
17.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
12.04.2024 | First examination report | |
18.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
08.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
08.09.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
17.02.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.09.2021 | Change - representative |