EP3984519 - ORAL CARE ARTICLE COMPRISING A HYDROPHOBIC DELIVERY CARRIER AND SOLID HYDROPHILIC PARTICLES COMPRISING A BLEACHING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAGEL, Paul Albert Cincinnati, 45202 / US | 02 /
RAJAIAH, Jayanth Cincinnati, 45202 / US | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 21198153.5 | 22.09.2021 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | US202063093513P | 19.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063093513 P | US202063093518P | 19.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063093518 P | US202063093523P | 19.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063093523 P | US202063093529P | 19.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063093529 P | US202063093536P | 19.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063093536 P | EP20200206897 | 11.11.2020 Original published format: EP 20206897 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984519 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02, A61K8/11, A61K8/22, A61Q11/00 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
A61K8/02 (EP);
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61K8/22 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGEARTIKEL MIT EINEM HYDROPHOBEN ABGABETRÄGER UND FESTEN HYDROPHILEN TEILCHEN MIT EINEM BLEICHMITTEL | [2022/16] | English: | ORAL CARE ARTICLE COMPRISING A HYDROPHOBIC DELIVERY CARRIER AND SOLID HYDROPHILIC PARTICLES COMPRISING A BLEACHING AGENT | [2022/16] | French: | ARTICLE DE SOIN ORAL COMPRENANT UN EXCIPIENT D'ADMINISTRATION HYDROPHOBE ET DES PARTICULES HYDROPHILES SOLIDES COMPRENANT UN AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 07.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]WO03015656 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al); | [XYI]WO2005110344 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2013096321 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | [Y]EP3315118 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | by applicant | US2835628 | US3506720 | EP0251591 | US5735942 | WO03015656 | US2013295525 |