EP4154735 - METHOD FOR MOISTURIZING A POUCHED PRODUCT FOR ORAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | 22.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | 22.09.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swedish Match North Europe AB 118 85 Stockholm / SE | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBERG, Jonas 461 55 Trollhättan / SE | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Gunnel 516 92 Äspered / SE | 03 /
LAI, Dennis 415 23 Göteborg / SE | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21198473.7 | 23.09.2021 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4154735 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24B13/00, A24F25/02 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
A24B13/00 (EP,KR);
A24F25/02 (EP,KR);
A24F23/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] |
Former [2023/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEFEUCHTUNG EINES BEUTELFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTS ZUR ORALEN VERWENDUNG | [2023/13] | English: | METHOD FOR MOISTURIZING A POUCHED PRODUCT FOR ORAL USE | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'HYDRATATION D'UN PRODUIT EN SACHET À USAGE ORAL | [2023/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 18.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4703765 (PAULES EUGENE H [US], et al); | [A]US5174088 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al); | [XA]US2016073681 (RUSHFORTH DAVID [GB], et al); | [A]US2021186081 (GERARDI ANTHONY RICHARD [US], et al) | by applicant | US4703765 | US6135120 | WO2007126361 | WO2008133563 | WO2012069505 | EP2428450 | US10463071 |