EP3960181 - CHEMICALS AND METHODS TO PREVENT AND TREAT TGF-BETA MEDIATED ACTIVATION OF FIBROBLASTS TO REDUCE AND TREAT CANCER AND FIBROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College 3810 W. Lakeshore Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARDELLI, James Allen Shreveport, Louisiana 71115 / US | 02 /
STEPHENS, Charles Albert Hot Springs, Arkansas, 71913 / US | 03 /
GRAY, Alana Lea Shreveport, Louisiana, 71106 / US | 04 /
COLEMAN, David Thomas Shreveport, Louisiana, 71106 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Karakatsanis, Georgios Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Dietlindenstrasse 18 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21198646.8 | 02.02.2017 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | US201662290002P | 02.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662290002 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3960181 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3960181 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7048 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P7/04 (EP,US);
A61K2300/00 (US);
A61K31/045 (EP,US);
A61K31/4412 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4709, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | CHEMIKALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON TGF-BETA-VERMITTELTER AKTIVIERUNG VON FIBROBLASTEN ZUR REDUZIERUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND FIBROSE | [2022/09] | English: | CHEMICALS AND METHODS TO PREVENT AND TREAT TGF-BETA MEDIATED ACTIVATION OF FIBROBLASTS TO REDUCE AND TREAT CANCER AND FIBROSIS | [2022/09] | French: | SUBSTANCES CHIMIQUES ET MÉTHODES POUR PRÉVENIR ET TRAITER L'ACTIVATION DES FIBROBLASTES MÉDIÉE PAR LE TGF-BÊTA, ET POUR COMBATTRE ET TRAITER LE CANCER ET LA FIBROSE | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17748126.4 / EP3411045 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 11.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.05.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.05.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MANNAERTS INGE ET AL, "The Hippo pathway effector YAP controls mouse hepatic stellate cell activation", JOURNAL OF HEPATOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150420), vol. 63, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.JHEP.2015.04.011, ISSN 0168-8278, pages 679 - 688, XP029259374 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods; Figures 1-7. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhep.2015.04.011 | [A] - WANG CHENG ET AL, "Knockdown of yes-associated protein inhibits proliferation and downregulates large tumor suppressor 1 expression in MHCC97H human hepatocellular carcinoma cells", MOLECULAR MEDICINE REPORTS, GR, (20150126), vol. 11, no. 6, doi:10.3892/mmr.2015.3257, ISSN 1791-2997, pages 4101 - 4108, XP055871131 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/mmr.2015.3257 | [A] - FITAMANT JULIEN ET AL, "YAP Inhibition Restores Hepatocyte Differentiation in Advanced HCC, Leading to Tumor Regression", CELL REPORTS, US, (20150301), vol. 10, no. 10, doi:10.1016/j.celrep.2015.02.027, ISSN 2211-1247, pages 1692 - 1707, XP055871132 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Summary; Figure 1; Discussion; Experimental procedures. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.celrep.2015.02.027 | [A] - Bai Haibo ET AL, "Evaluation of YAP as a therapeutic target in HCC and CCA.", (20150401), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://faseb.onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1096/fasebj.29.1_supplement.45.4, (20211209), XP055871290 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - JIAO SHI ET AL, "A Peptide Mimicking VGLL4 Function Acts as a YAP Antagonist Therapy against Gastric Cancer", CANCER CELL, CELL PRESS, US, (20140210), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CCR.2014.01.010, ISSN 1535-6108, pages 166 - 180, XP028610274 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Summary; Discussion; Experimental procedures. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2014.01.010 | [A] - BRODOWSKA KATARZYNA ET AL, "The clinically used photosensitizer Verteporfin (VP) inhibits YAP-TEAD and human retinoblastoma cell growth in vitro without light activation", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, LONDON, (20140515), vol. 124, doi:10.1016/J.EXER.2014.04.011, ISSN 0014-4835, pages 67 - 73, XP028873521 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2014.04.011 | [X] - SILVIS MARK R. ET AL, "[alpha]-Catenin Is a Tumor Suppressor That Controls Cell Accumulation by Regulating the Localization and Activity of the Transcriptional Coactivator Yap1", SCIENCE SIGNALING, US, vol. 4, no. 174, doi:10.1126/scisignal.2001823, ISSN 1945-0877, (20110524), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC3366274/pdf/nihms376579.pdf, XP055870843 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Discussion; Materials and methods; Figures 1-5. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scisignal.2001823 | by applicant | - Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, (20000000), vol. 5-6 | - HARRIS et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19920000), vol. 81, no. 1, pages 1 - 10 | - "American Academy of Pediatrics: Alternative Routes of Drug Administration---Advantages and Disadvantages (Subject Review", Pediatrics, (19970000), vol. 100, no. 1, pages 143 - 152 |