EP3985896 - FORWARD ERROR CORRECTION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHADEVAN, Amitkumar Edison, 08837 / US | 02 /
LEFEVRE, Yannick 3001 Heverlee / BE | 03 /
MAES, Jochen 2018 Antwerp / BE | 04 /
HOUTSMA, Vincent New Providence, 07974 / US | 05 /
VAN VEEN, Doutje New Providence, 07974 / US | 06 /
DE LIND VAN WIJNGAARDEN, Adriaan New Providence, 07974 / US | 07 /
FIVEZ, Michaël 2500 Lier / BE | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/16] | IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 21199392.8 | 28.09.2021 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | US202063092473P | 15.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063092473 P | US202117470293 | 09.09.2021 Original published format: US202117470293 | [2022/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3985896 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
H04L1/0011 (EP);
H04L1/004 (CN);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
H03M13/6362 (US);
H04B10/516 (US);
H04B10/60 (US);
H04L1/0025 (EP);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (US);
H04L1/0057 (CN);
H04L1/0067 (EP);
H04L1/007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORWÄRTSFEHLERKORREKTURSTEUERUNG | [2022/16] | English: | FORWARD ERROR CORRECTION CONTROL | [2022/16] | French: | COMMANDE DE CORRECTION AVAL D'ERREURS | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 20.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2017113349 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-7,12,14,15 * page 4, line 19 - page 19, line 13 * * figures 1-9 * [A] 9 [I] 8,10,11,13; | [A]US9893838 (ARUNARTHI VENKAT [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |