EP3981988 - PUMP SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A PUMP SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frideco AG Gigering 27 8213 Neunkirch / CH | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stähle, Carl 8213 Neunkirch / CH | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 21199573.3 | 28.09.2021 | [2022/15] | Priority number, date | DE202010125805 | 02.10.2020 Original published format: DE102020125805 | [2022/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981988 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F04D9/04 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
F04D9/041 (EP,US);
F04C11/005 (US);
F04C19/001 (US);
F04D13/02 (US);
F04D29/2288 (US);
F04D7/045 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUMPENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES PUMPENSYSTEMS | [2022/15] | English: | PUMP SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A PUMP SYSTEM | [2022/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POMPE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE POMPE | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 11.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 17.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS588292 (TOKYO TATSUNO KK) [Y] 10-12 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0298949 (KAMYR AB [SE]) [X] 1-9,13 * abstract * [Y] 10-12; | [Y]US6488468 (DANIELSSON PETER [SE], et al) [Y] 1,12* figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2005053496 (DANIELSSON PETER [SE], et al) [Y] 1,12 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | AU2004237829B |