EP3979657 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC GENERATION OF CHARTS IN A PERSONALIZED VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infosys Limited IP Cell Plot No. 44 Electronics City Hosur Road 560-100 Bangalore / IN | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, Reshma Chennai TN / IN | 02 /
SIVASANKARAN, Sowbarnika Chennai TN / IN | 03 /
RAJENDRAN, Pradeepraj Tiruvannamalai TN / IN | 04 /
SUNIL, GUPTA Ambala HR / IN | 05 /
VENKATARAJA, Guruprasad Nellitheertha Bangalore KA / IN | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Savi, Massimiliano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 21199789.5 | 29.09.2021 | [2022/14] | Priority number, date | IN202043042549 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: IN202043042549 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979657 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/431, H04N21/4722, H04N21/854, H04N21/81 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H04N21/431 (EP);
H04N21/4316 (EP);
H04N21/4722 (EP);
H04N21/8153 (EP);
H04N21/854 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] |
Former [2022/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DYNAMISCHEN ERZEUGUNG VON CHARTS IN EINEM PERSONALISIERTEN VIDEO | [2022/14] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC GENERATION OF CHARTS IN A PERSONALIZED VIDEO | [2022/14] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DYNAMIQUE DE DIAGRAMMES DANS UNE VIDÉO PERSONNALISÉE | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 15.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006105480 (GUIDEWORKS LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-18* paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0103] *; | [I]WO2007098260 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0056] *; | [I]US2010023863 (COHEN-MARTIN JACK [US]) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0130] * * claim 16 * |