EP4160390 - METHOD AND ASSEMBLY FOR COMMISSIONING AN UPDATED APPLICATION FOR AN INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Götz, Jan 91054 Buckenhof / DE | 02 /
Reichmann, Jürgen 81825 München / DE | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21199868.7 | 29.09.2021 | [2023/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160390 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4160390 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/65, G06F11/36, G06F8/70 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP,KR,US);
G05B19/042 (KR);
G05B19/4185 (US);
G05B19/048 (KR);
G05B19/4155 (KR);
G05B23/02 (KR);
G06F11/3692 (EP);
G06F8/71 (US);
G06F11/3664 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR INBETRIEBNAHME EINER AKTUALISIERTEN ANWENDUNG FÜR EINE INDUSTRIELLE AUTOMATISIERUNGSANORDNUNG | [2023/14] | English: | METHOD AND ASSEMBLY FOR COMMISSIONING AN UPDATED APPLICATION FOR AN INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION DEVICE | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT DE MISE EN SERVICE D'UNE APPLICATION MISE À JOUR POUR UN AGENCEMENT D'AUTOMATISATION INDUSTRIELLE | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 02.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015192918 (OBERMEIER SEBASTIAN [CH], et al); | [A]US2019297160 (HARRIMAN MERRILL [US], et al) |