Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4160992 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP21200111 US202217937159



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2023099315Global Dossier 30.03.2023A1
Priority number Date
EP21200111 30.09.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4160992Global Dossier 12.06.2024B1
EP4160992 05.04.2023A1
Priority number Date
EP21200111 30.09.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2994210T 20.01.2025T3
Priority number Date
EP21200111 30.09.2021