EP3978993 - OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE ELEMENT, AND OPTICAL MODULATION DEVICE AND OPTICAL TRANSMISSION APPARATUS USING OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co., Ltd. 1-9-2 Higashi-Shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8641 / JP | [2023/48] |
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO., LTD. 6-28 Rokuban-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8465 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAOKA, Yu Tokyo, 102-8465 / JP | 02 /
TAKANO, Shingo Tokyo, 102-8465 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZAKI, Norikazu Tokyo, 102-8465 / JP | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Sonnenberg Harrison Partnerschaft mbB Herzogspitalstraße 10a 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Staudt, Hans-Peter Staudt IP Law Donaustrasse 7 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 21200131.7 | 30.09.2021 | [2022/14] | Priority number, date | JP20200165002 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: JP 2020165002 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978993 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/035, G02F1/21, G02F1/225 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G02F1/0353 (EP,US);
G02F1/212 (EP);
G02F1/225 (EP);
G02F2201/063 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] |
Former [2022/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES WELLENLEITERELEMENT, OPTISCHE MODULATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND OPTISCHE ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM OPTISCHEN WELLENLEITERELEMENT | [2022/14] | English: | OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE ELEMENT, AND OPTICAL MODULATION DEVICE AND OPTICAL TRANSMISSION APPARATUS USING OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE ELEMENT | [2022/14] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE GUIDE D'ONDE OPTIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF DE MODULATION OPTIQUE ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION OPTIQUE UTILISANT UN ÉLÉMENT DE GUIDE D'ONDE OPTIQUE | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 04.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5838869 (RASCH ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A]WO2004008202 (OPTIMER PHOTONICS INC [US], et al); | [Y]JP2009244812 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD); | [A]US2015277156 (KONDOU KATSUTOSHI [JP]); | [XY]US2017052424 (IWATSUKA SHINJI [JP], et al) |