Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
03.06.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
01.06.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
01.06.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
27.02.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.09.2022 | Change - designated states | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.03.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
04.03.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
02.10.2021 | Change - representative |