Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11761697 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2023 | B2 | US2022107126 | 07.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200127983 | 05.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220045360 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200127983 | 05.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114383227B | Global Dossier | 26.03.2024 | B | CN114383227 | 22.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200127983 | 05.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3978832 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2024 | B1 | EP3978832 | 06.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200127983 | 05.10.2020 |