EP3934295 - KEY PROTECTION PROCESSING METHOD, APPARATUS, DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Zhaolong Beijing / CN | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 21200458.4 | 01.10.2021 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | CN202011376585 | 30.11.2020 Original published format: CN202011376585 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3934295 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3934295 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/041, H04W12/0431, H04L9/08, H04L9/32 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H04W12/041 (EP);
H04L9/0625 (CN,KR);
H04L9/0869 (US);
G06F21/602 (CN,KR);
H04L63/0428 (EP);
H04L63/0442 (EP);
H04L63/06 (EP);
H04L9/0825 (KR);
H04L9/0838 (EP);
H04L9/0861 (CN,KR);
H04L9/14 (US);
H04L9/30 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | H04W12/041, H04W12/0431 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLÜSSELSCHUTZVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, GERÄT, VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/01] | English: | KEY PROTECTION PROCESSING METHOD, APPARATUS, DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PROTECTION DE CLÉ, APPAREIL, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2020259800 (MASNY DANIEL SIEGFRIED WERNER [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0048] *; | [X]EP3534565 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD [KY]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0022]; figure 1B * |