Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018165233 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715452819 | 08.03.2017 | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017044523 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12064626 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2024 | B2 | US2021077813 | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715452819 | 08.03.2017 | WO2016US50619 | 08.09.2016 | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | US202017102071 | 23.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10842994 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2020 | B2 | US2017173334 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715452819 | 08.03.2017 | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | WO2016US50619 | 08.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10758736 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2020 | B2 | US2018243571 | 30.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | WO2016US50619 | 08.09.2016 | US201615758019 | 08.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3592311 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2021 | B1 | EP3592311 | 06.01.2021 | A4 | EP3592311 | 15.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715452819 | 08.03.2017 | WO2018US21255 | 07.03.2018 | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110402126 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715452819 | 08.03.2017 | WO2018US21255 | 07.03.2018 | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021200038B | Global Dossier | 22.12.2022 | B2 | AU2021200038 | 18.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715452819 | 08.03.2017 | AU2021200038 | 06.01.2021 | AU2018230730 | 07.03.2018 | WO2018US21255 | 07.03.2018 | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018230730B | Global Dossier | 03.12.2020 | B2 | AU2018230730 | 10.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715452819 | 08.03.2017 | WO2018US21255 | 07.03.2018 | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016318802 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | WO2016US50619 | 08.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3954431 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2022 | B1 | EP3954431 | 16.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18763227 | 07.03.2018 | US201715452819 | 08.03.2017 | WO2018US21255 | 07.03.2018 | US201562215805 | 09.09.2015 | Type | Earlier application | EP3592311 |