EP3993452 - PAIRING A HOME APPLIANCE WITH A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grimminger, Jochen 89407 Dillingen / DE | 02 /
Schaefer, Frank 82178 Puchheim / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21200965.8 | 05.10.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | DE202010213754 | 02.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020213754 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993452 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3993452 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04L12/28, H04W4/80 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP);
G08C17/02 (CN);
G01S13/08 (CN);
G01S15/08 (CN);
G01S17/08 (CN);
H04L12/2803 (EP);
H04M1/72406 (CN);
H04M1/72415 (CN);
H04W4/021 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOPPLUNG EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTS MIT EINEM MOBILGERÄT | [2022/18] | English: | PAIRING A HOME APPLIANCE WITH A MOBILE DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | COUPLAGE D'UN APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER AVEC UN APPAREIL MOBILE | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 04.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2015130574 (NEC SAITAMA LTD); | [I]DE102017109935 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) |