EP3974407 - AZEOTROPE-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1,1,1,2,3-PENTACHLOROPROPANE AND HYDROGEN FLUORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUNG, Hsueh Sung Getzville, 14068 / US | 02 /
PHAM, Hang T. Amherst, 14228 / US | 03 /
SINGH, Rajiv R Amherst, 14068 / US | 04 /
MERKEL, Daniel C Morristown, 07979 / US | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Stepney, Gregory John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21201049.0 | 29.10.2009 | [2022/13] | Priority number, date | US20080110216P | 31.10.2008 Original published format: US 110216 P | US20090607851 | 28.10.2009 Original published format: US 607851 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974407 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C19/01, C11D7/50, C23G5/028, C01B7/19, C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C09K3/30 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
C23G5/02806 (EP,US);
C07C19/01 (EP,KR,US);
C01B7/19 (KR);
C01B7/191 (EP,US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US);
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AZEOTROPE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS 1,1,1,2,3-PENTACHLORPROPAN UND FLUORWASSERSTOFF | [2022/13] | English: | AZEOTROPE-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1,1,1,2,3-PENTACHLOROPROPANE AND HYDROGEN FLUORIDE | [2022/13] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE TYPE AZÉOTROPE DE 1,1,1,2,3-PENTACHLOROPROPANE ET DE FLUORURE D'HYDROGÈNE | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 29.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09824112.8 / EP2344433 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2103587 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [XP] 1-5,9,11,12 * page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraphs 9-12 * * figures 1-7 * * page 5, paragraph 27 * * page 6, paragraphs 28-29 * * page 8, paragraph 43 - page 9, paragraph 44; example 3; table 1 * * claims 1, 5 *; | [XP]WO2009015317 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,11 * page 3, lines 11-17 * * page 5, lines 5-10 * * page 6, lines 1-7 * * claims 1, 3, 4 *; | [XI]WO2008054781 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,11,12 * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 15 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 21 * * claims 1, 3, 5, 14-17, 27-29 * [I] 8; | [A]US6759381 (JOHNSON ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |