02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
20.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
07.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
31.05.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
29.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] |
23.06.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
19.06.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.06.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.06.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.03.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.01.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
06.01.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
08.11.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.11.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.05.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
27.05.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
06.10.2021 |
Change - representative |
|