EP4019357 - VEHICLE ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE, VEHICLE ELECTRONIC CONTROL METHOD, AND NON-TRANSITORY STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIDA, Tomoaki Toyota-Shi, Aichi-Ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
ISHIHARA, Hideaki Toyota-Shi, Aichi-Ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21201075.5 | 05.10.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | JP20200218660 | 28.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020218660 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019357 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4019357 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W60/00, B60W50/023, G06F11/16, G05D1/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
B60W60/0053 (EP,CN,US);
B60W50/02 (RU);
B60W50/029 (KR);
B60R16/033 (KR,US);
B60W30/181 (KR);
B60W40/08 (CN,KR);
B60W40/105 (KR);
B60W50/023 (EP);
B60W60/001 (KR);
B60W60/0018 (CN);
B60W60/0051 (KR);
B60W60/0057 (EP,US);
G05D1/0061 (EP);
G06F11/2038 (EP);
G06F11/2048 (EP);
B60W2040/0881 (KR);
B60W2050/0006 (EP);
B60W2050/007 (KR);
B60W2510/244 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2520/04 (KR);
B60W2520/10 (KR);
B60W2540/223 (EP);
B60W2540/225 (EP);
B60W2540/227 (US);
B60W2540/229 (EP);
B60W2556/00 (US);
B60W2720/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHES FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND NICHTFLÜCHTIGES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/26] | English: | VEHICLE ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE, VEHICLE ELECTRONIC CONTROL METHOD, AND NON-TRANSITORY STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE DE VÉHICULE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE DE VÉHICULE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT NON TRANSITOIRE | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 08.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | LU | 05.10.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/30] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 05.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3284646 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1; claims 1-3,5 *; | [A]US2019126911 (NIENHUESER DENNIS [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0070] - [0073]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2020051345 (KOLLER OLIVER DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-4* paragraphs [0048] , [0054] - [0063] * | by applicant | JP2003015743 |