EP3968732 - PRINTER AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2023/52] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 SHIMOMARUKO 3-CHOME OHTA-KU Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIYA, Takashi Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
SUGA, Kenichiro Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21201431.0 | 24.07.2018 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | JP20170155887 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017155887 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968732 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3968732 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04W76/15, G06F3/12, H04W76/14, H04W84/12 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04N1/00307 (EP,CN,US);
H04W88/06 (KR);
G06F3/1231 (US);
G06F3/122 (US);
G06F3/1254 (US);
G06F3/1292 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/0053 (US);
H04L5/06 (US);
H04N1/00315 (CN);
H04W48/16 (CN);
H04W72/02 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W76/10 (CN);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (CN);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/20 (KR);
G06F3/1236 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | H04W76/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRUCKER UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES DRUCKERS | [2022/11] | English: | PRINTER AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A PRINTER | [2022/11] | French: | IMPRIMANTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 30.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18185193.2 / EP3442303 | Divisional application(s) | EP23213662.2 / EP4325996 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | IT | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2605607 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0100] * * claims 1, 4 *; | [A]US2013252640 (KENNEY THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * | by applicant | JP2010278825 | JP5279151B |