EP3982342 - MEDIUM HANDLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLORY LTD. 3-1, Shimoteno 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-8567 / JP | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamada, Takuro Hyogo, 670-8567 / JP | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 21201477.3 | 07.10.2021 | [2022/15] | Priority number, date | JP20200169495 | 07.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020169495 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982342 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3982342 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G07D11/10, G07D11/40 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G07D11/40 (EP,US);
G07D11/13 (US);
G07D11/10 (EP);
G07D11/14 (US);
G07D2211/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEDIENHANDHABUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/15] | English: | MEDIUM HANDLING DEVICE | [2022/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION DE SUPPORT | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2012012435 (ROOSCH PIETER RENS [NL]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11-13 * figures 1, 2, 4 * [A] 6-10 [I] 14,15; | [X]WO2012066730 (HITACHI OMRON TERMINAL SOLUTIONS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * figures 1,2,29,32 *; | [X]US2015243119 (HAYASHI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,12 *; | [A]EP3032506 (NAUTILUS HYOSUNG INC [KR]) [A] 14,15* figure 5 *; | [X]KR102012349B (HYOSUNG TNS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10 * figures 1-3 * |