EP4120138 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MOLECULAR PROPERTY PREDICTION USING HYPERGRAPH MESSAGE PASSING NEURAL NETWORK (HMPNN) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakhinana, Sagar Srinivas 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
Nistala, Sri Harsha 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
Buddhiraju, Venkata Sudheendra 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | 04 /
Runkana, Venkataramana 411013 Pune, Maharashtra / IN | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21201603.4 | 08.10.2021 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | IN202121032177 | 16.07.2021 Original published format: IN202121032177 | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120138 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4120138 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G16C20/30, G16C20/70 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
G16C20/30 (EP);
G06N3/042 (EP);
G06N3/0442 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06N3/09 (EP);
G16C20/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE VON MOLEKULAREN EIGENSCHAFTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES NEURONALEN HYPERGRAPH-NACHRICHTENAUSTAUSCH-NETZES (HMPNN) | [2023/03] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MOLECULAR PROPERTY PREDICTION USING HYPERGRAPH MESSAGE PASSING NEURAL NETWORK (HMPNN) | [2023/03] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION DE PROPRIÉTÉ MOLÉCULAIRE UTILISANT UN RÉSEAU DE NEURONES DE PASSAGE DE MESSAGES HYPERGRAPH (HMPNN) | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 26.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2020050737 (KAJINO HIROSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0055] ** figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO2021062366 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0087] * * figures 1-5 * |