EP4162860 - AN ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ambu A/S Baltorpbakken 13 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Søren 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
SILBERMANN, Victor 8653 Them / DK | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21201608.3 | 08.10.2021 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162860 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/005, A61B1/00 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A61B1/0057 (EP);
A61B1/0011 (EP);
A61B1/0055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP | [2023/15] | English: | AN ENDOSCOPE | [2023/15] | French: | ENDOSCOPE | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 04.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002191550 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] ** figures 2, 3, 5 *; | [XI]US2016029878 (YAMAZAKI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0045] , [ 0046] , [ 0050] - [0054] - [ 0059] , [ 0060] - [0064] * * paragraphs [0097] , [ 0100] , [ 0101] * * figures 1, 3, 9 * [I] 8; | [A]US2020281445 (MATTHISON-HANSEN KASPAR MAT [DK], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0113] , [ 0115] , [ 0118] , [ 0120] * * figures 1a, 1b, 3a, 3b, 4c *; | [E]WO2021219181 (AMBU AS [DK]) [E] 1-4,7,8 * page 5, line 27 - page 7, line 23 * * page 9, line 11 - line 32 * * figures 1, 3, 4, 5 * | by applicant | US2015335227 | US2020196835 |