EP4164255 - 6DOF RENDERING OF MICROPHONE-ARRAY CAPTURED AUDIO FOR LOCATIONS OUTSIDE THE MICROPHONE-ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAITINEN, Mikko-Ville 02130 Espoo / FI | 02 /
POLITIS, Archontis 33500 Tampere / FI | 03 /
PAJUNEN, Lauros Anton 00400 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
VILKAMO, Juha 00120 Helsinki / FI | 05 /
ERONEN, Antti 33820 Tampere / FI | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/15] | Smith, Gary John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 21201766.9 | 08.10.2021 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4164255 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
H04S7/303 (EP);
H04S7/304 (EP,US);
H04R3/005 (US);
H04R5/027 (US);
H04S3/008 (US);
H04S7/306 (EP);
H04R2201/401 (US);
H04S2400/01 (US);
H04S2400/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] |
Former [2023/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 6DOF-WIEDERGABE VON DURCH MIKROFONANORDNUNG ERFASSTEM AUDIO FÜR ORTE AUSSERHALB DER MIKROFONANORDNUNGEN | [2023/15] | English: | 6DOF RENDERING OF MICROPHONE-ARRAY CAPTURED AUDIO FOR LOCATIONS OUTSIDE THE MICROPHONE-ARRAYS | [2023/15] | French: | RENDU 6DOF D'AUDIO CAPTURÉ PAR RÉSEAU DE MICROPHONES POUR DES EMPLACEMENTS EN DEHORS DES RÉSEAUX DE MICROPHONES | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 11.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2020029164 (SWAMINATHAN SIDDHARTHA GOUTHAM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2587357 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2592388 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2021170900 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [X] 1-15 * page 17, line 8 - line 21; figures 6, 7, 9; claims 1, 2, 21, 23, 24 * * page 22, line 16 - page 24, line 4 * * page 30, line 27 - page 31, line 3 * * page 34, line 2 - line 9 * * page 37, line 13 - line 21 * | by applicant | WO2018091776 | WO2019086757 | - PULKKI, VILLE, "Spatial sound reproduction with directional audio coding", Journal of the Audio Engineering Society, (20070000), vol. 55, no. 6, pages 503 - 516 | - ARCHONTIS POLITISJUHA VILKAMOVILLE PULKKI, "Sector-based parametric sound field reproduction in the spherical harmonic domain", IEEE Journal of Selected Topics in Signal Processing, (20150000), vol. 9, no. 5, doi:10.1109/JSTSP.2015.2415762, pages 852 - 866, XP011662882 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSTSP.2015.2415762 | - "Binaural reproduction for directional audio coding", LAITINEN, M.V., Master's thesis, Helsinki University of Technology, (20080000), pages 54 - 55 | GB19680025723 | GB20200002710 |