EP4164304 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLOCK SYNCHRONISATION IN A WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imec VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASLAM, Muhammad 9000 Gent / BE | 02 /
JIAO, Xianjun 9052 Gent / BE | 03 /
LIU, Wei 9820 Merelbeke / BE | 04 /
MOERMAN, Ingrid 9810 Nazareth / BE | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/15] | IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 21201783.4 | 08.10.2021 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4164304 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
H04W56/0045 (EP);
H04W56/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] |
Former [2023/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TAKTSYNCHRONISIERUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERK | [2023/15] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLOCK SYNCHRONISATION IN A WIRELESS NETWORK | [2023/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE SYNCHRONISATION D'HORLOGE DANS UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 12.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011216660 (LEE JUNG GUN [US], et al); | [XI]US2011255528 (ZAKRZEWSKI RADOSLAW ROMUALD [US]); |