EP3988387 - FOLDING SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daechang Seat Co., Ltd.-Dongtan (Banggyo-dong) 6, Dongtansandan 10-gil Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18487 / KR | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Jae Kwang 18145 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
LEE, Myung Soo 18120 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
CHO, Chan Ki 25305 Gangwon-do / KR | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 21202108.3 | 12.10.2021 | [2022/17] | Priority number, date | KR20200136891 | 21.10.2020 Original published format: KR 20200136891 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988387 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3988387 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/30 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
B60N2/3047 (EP,US);
B60N2/3009 (CN);
B60N2/3011 (US);
B60N2/3045 (CN);
B60N2/305 (US);
B60N2/366 (US);
B60N2/68 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | KLAPPBARER SITZ | [2022/17] | English: | FOLDING SEAT | [2022/17] | French: | SIÈGE RABATTABLE | [2022/17] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 27.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004032155 (YAMADA TAKUROU [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,3 *; | [Y]EP3473543 (AMI IND INC [US]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] ** figures 2b, 3a * | by applicant | KR100794038B | KR101643888B |