Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4012415 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4012415



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 750
31.05.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.05.2023 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
31.05.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
31.05.2023 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
31.05.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.02.2023 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.02.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2023 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 3
13.02.2023 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 8
13.02.2023 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
13.02.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.02.2023 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 2
12.12.2022 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.11.2022 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
08.11.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.11.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 6
08.11.2022 European search report Search / examination 7
08.11.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
01.08.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
01.08.2022 Partial European search report Search / examination 7
01.08.2022 Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results Search / examination 6
22.07.2022 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
01.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.07.2022 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
18.05.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.04.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
22.04.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
22.04.2022 Partial European search report Search / examination 6
22.04.2022 Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results Search / examination 5
04.04.2022 Search started Search / examination 1
07.01.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.01.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
07.01.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.01.2022 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
28.10.2021 Invitation to file claims Search / examination 1
12.10.2021 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.10.2021 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
12.10.2021 Sequence listing Search / examination 0
12.10.2021 Description Search / examination 191
12.10.2021 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
12.10.2021 Drawings Search / examination 43
12.10.2021 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 10
12.10.2021 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
27.06.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 184
27.06.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 211