EP3957237 - APPARATUS FOR VITAL SIGNAL SENSING USING A MILLIMETER-WAVE RADAR SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAHETI, Ashutosh 81541 München / DE | 02 /
JUNGMAIER, Reinhard-Wolfgang 4072 Alkoven / AT | 03 /
SANTRA, Avik 81541 München / DE | 04 /
TROTTA, Saverio 80538 München / DE | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 21202302.2 | 16.01.2019 | [2022/08] | Priority number, date | US201815872701 | 16.01.2018 Original published format: US201815872701 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957237 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/0507, A61B5/00, G01S7/41, G01S13/32, G01S13/536, G01S13/88, H01L23/52, H01L23/538, H01L23/66, H01L25/04 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
A61B5/024 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,US);
A61B5/02444 (EP,US);
A61B5/02455 (US);
A61B5/0507 (EP,US);
A61B5/35 (US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,US);
A61B5/7225 (CN);
G01S13/32 (EP,US);
G01S13/536 (EP,US);
G01S13/88 (EP,CN,US);
G01S7/032 (US);
G01S7/415 (EP,US);
H01L23/52 (EP,US);
H01L23/5383 (EP);
H01L23/5384 (US);
H01L23/5385 (US);
H01L23/5389 (EP);
H01L23/66 (EP);
H01L25/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] |
Former [2022/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VITALSIGNALERFASSUNG MITTELS EINES MILLIMETERWELLENRADARSENSORS | [2022/08] | English: | APPARATUS FOR VITAL SIGNAL SENSING USING A MILLIMETER-WAVE RADAR SENSOR | [2022/08] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE SIGNAUX VITAUX À L'AIDE D'UN CAPTEUR RADAR À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES | [2022/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 19.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19152111.1 / EP3511732 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |