EP3961780 - FABRICATING METHOD OF ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/09] | FABRICATING METHOD OF ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL CONTAINING THE SAME | ||
[2023/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07335 / KR | [2022/35] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Ji Won 305-380 DAEJEON / KR | 02 /
YOU, Seung Jae 305-380 DAEJEON / KR | 03 /
KO, Myung Hoon 305-380 DAEJEON / KR | 04 /
BAN, Jin Ho 305-380 DAEJEON / KR | 05 /
LEE, Hyang Mok 305-380 DAEJEON / KR | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21202322.0 | 23.05.2013 | [2022/09] | Priority number, date | KR20120055074 | 23.05.2012 Original published format: KR 20120055074 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961780 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3961780 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M10/0583, H01G11/12, H01G11/86, H01M10/0525, H01M50/46, H01M50/403, H01M50/406, H01M50/431, H01M50/489 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H01G11/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0585 (KR);
H01M4/04 (US);
H01G11/86 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0413 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0445 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0468 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0583 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/0404 (US);
H01M50/403 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/406 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/431 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/46 (US);
H01M50/461 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,CN,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/13 (KR,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | H01M10/04, H01M10/0583, H01G11/12, H01G11/86, H01M10/0525, H01M50/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG | [2023/14] | English: | FABRICATING METHOD OF ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ASSEMBLAGE D'ÉLECTRODES | [2023/14] |
Former [2022/09] | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG UND ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLE DAMIT | ||
Former [2022/09] | FABRICATING METHOD OF ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL CONTAINING THE SAME | ||
Former [2022/09] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRODE ET CELLULE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE LE CONTENANT | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 29.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13794327.0 / EP2808933 | EP18206871.8 / EP3471188 | EP20156658.5 / EP3671929 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004097971 (ENERLAND CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 19 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010304198 (AHN CHANGBUM [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2011135996 (AHN CHANGBUM [KR], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]KR20110112241 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO2012008742 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * example 6 *; | [AP]EP2557626 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-12 * paragraphs [0072] - [0086]; figures 7,12-14 *; | [AP]EP2595232 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-12 * paragraph [0041]; figure 6 * | by applicant | KR20010082058 | KR20010082059 | KR20010082060 | KR20120055074 | KR20130058165 |