EP3985813 - SPARK PLUG FOR CONTROLLED IGNITION MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW H POWERTRAIN HOLDING, S.L.U. Avenida de Madrid número 72 47008 Valladolid / ES | [2024/10] |
Former [2022/30] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Besancon, Thomas 92430 Bourg la Reine / FR | 02 /
LAURENT, Jean-Marc 92240 MALAKOFF / FR | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/16] | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. API : TCR GRA 2 36 1, Avenue du Golf 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21202510.0 | 13.10.2021 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | FR20200010457 | 13.10.2020 Original published format: FR 2010457 | [2022/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3985813 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/54, F02P15/08, // H01T13/22, H01T13/32, H01T13/46, F02P3/02, F02P15/02 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
F02P15/08 (EP);
H01T13/22 (EP);
H01T13/32 (EP);
H01T13/46 (EP);
H01T13/54 (EP);
F02P15/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZÜNDKERZE FÜR EINEN FREMDGEZÜNDETEN MOTOR | [2022/16] | English: | SPARK PLUG FOR CONTROLLED IGNITION MOTOR | [2022/16] | French: | BOUGIE D'ALLUMAGE POUR MOTEUR À ALLUMAGE COMMANDÉ | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 06.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2275505 (TARGONSKI ROY [GB]) [X] 1,4-10 * page 4, line 1 - line 13; figure 1 * [I] 11,12; | [XI]JP2007064101 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,3,4,6-11 * figure - *[I] 5,12; | [XI]US2007169737 (GONG WEIDONG [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11 * paragraphs [0030] - [0031]; figure - * [I] 6,12; | [XYI]JP2011122515 (YANMAR CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,6-10 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 50]; figures 7,8(a), 8(b) * [Y] 4,5 [I] 12; | [XYI]CN109555593 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG) [X] 1-11 * page 5; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 12 | by applicant | US2019323415 |