EP3988411 - CONTROL DEVICE OF HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzuki Motor Corporation 300 Takatsuka-cho, Minami-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 432-8611 / JP | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/17] | For all designated states Suzuki Motor Corporation 300, Takatsuka-cho Minami-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 432-8611 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iino, Hayato Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka, 432-8611 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Kosuke Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka, 432-8611 / JP | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/17] | 01 /
Iino, Hayato Shizuoka, 432-8611 / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Kosuke Shizuoka, 432-8611 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 21202746.0 | 14.10.2021 | [2022/17] | Priority number, date | JP20200178916 | 26.10.2020 Original published format: JP 2020178916 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988411 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3988411 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | [2022/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3988411 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/13 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP);
B60W20/13 (EP);
B60W2510/246 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES HYBRIDFAHRZEUGS | [2022/17] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE OF HYBRID VEHICLE | [2022/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | [2022/17] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 21.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009119953 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0164] *; | [A]JP2011131829 (MITSUBISHI FUSO TRUCK & BUS) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2012040928 (AISIN AW CO) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2012116394 (DAIMLER AG) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y]US2020036315 (SATO MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2015051676 |