EP3958420 - CURRENT LIMITING CIRCUIT FOR POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stark, Stefan 6835 Muntlix / AT | 02 /
Hauer, Lukas 6841 Mäder / AT | 03 /
Schmölzer, Andreas 6820 Frastanz / AT | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21202843.5 | 15.01.2018 | [2022/08] | Priority number, date | DE201720100740U | 13.02.2017 Original published format: DE 202017100740 U | AT20170000040U | 24.02.2017 Original published format: AT 4017 U | AT20170000140U | 27.06.2017 Original published format: AT 14017 U | [2022/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958420 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3958420 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/16, H02H9/00, H05B45/355, H05B45/38 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
H02H9/001 (EP,US);
H02H7/16 (EP);
H05B45/355 (EP,US);
H05B45/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG ZUR EINSCHALTSTROMBEGRENZUNG BEI EINEM NETZTEIL | [2022/08] | English: | CURRENT LIMITING CIRCUIT FOR POWER SUPPLY | [2022/08] | French: | CIRCUIT DE LIMITATION DE COURANT TRANSITOIRE DANS UN BLOC D'ALIMENTATION | [2022/08] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 02.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18700487.4 / EP3580824 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | IT | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | MC | 19.07.2023 | NL | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SI | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SI | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 19.07.2023 | |
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 19.07.2023 | |
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 19.07.2023 | |
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 19.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003035311 (PHADKE VIJAY GANGADHAR [PH]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0032] - [0044]; figure 6a *; | [A]EP2249627 (OSRAM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0018] - [0023]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2016301227 (HUMPHREY DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0017] - [0030]; figure 2c * | by applicant | EP0637118 | DE102011001990 |