Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9822032 | ![]() | 21.11.2017 | B2 | US2015118497 | 30.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313903433 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | US201514591361 | 07.01.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8951927 | ![]() | 10.02.2015 | B2 | US2014227523 | 14.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313903433 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8946103 | ![]() | 03.02.2015 | B2 | US2014186632 | 03.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414197658 | 05.03.2014 | US201313903433 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12227449 | ![]() | 18.02.2025 | B2 | US2023382782 | 30.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318232968 | 11.08.2023 | US201715795844 | 27.10.2017 | US202016799451 | 24.02.2020 | US201313903433 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | US201514591361 | 07.01.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11767253 | ![]() | 26.09.2023 | B2 | US2020189963 | 18.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715795844 | 27.10.2017 | US202016799451 | 24.02.2020 | US201313903433 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | US201514591361 | 07.01.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11447415 | ![]() | 20.09.2022 | B2 | US2022009819 | 13.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715795844 | 27.10.2017 | US202117483276 | 23.09.2021 | US202016799451 | 24.02.2020 | US201313903433 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | US201514591361 | 07.01.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10570053 | ![]() | 25.02.2020 | B2 | US2018050952 | 22.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715795844 | 27.10.2017 | US201313903433 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | US201514591361 | 07.01.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102651562B | ![]() | 28.03.2024 | B1 | KR20220165794 | 15.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | KR20217033447 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102472676B | ![]() | 30.11.2022 | B1 | KR20210129737 | 28.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20217023220 | 28.05.2013 | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102472180B | ![]() | 29.11.2022 | B1 | KR20210129738 | 28.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20217023220 | 28.05.2013 | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102462318B | ![]() | 03.11.2022 | B1 | KR20210094675 | 29.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20147037052 | 28.05.2013 | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102282976B | ![]() | 29.07.2021 | B1 | KR20150021555 | 02.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022040392 | ![]() | 10.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | JP2019097818 | 24.05.2019 | JP2021107349 | 29.06.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7399198B | ![]() | 15.12.2023 | B2 | JP2022040391 | 10.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | JP2019097818 | 24.05.2019 | JP2021107349 | 29.06.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7089095B | ![]() | 21.06.2022 | B2 | JP2021151951 | 30.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | JP2019097818 | 24.05.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6906563B | ![]() | 21.07.2021 | B2 | JP2019142770 | 29.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | JP2017073523 | 03.04.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6305992B | ![]() | 04.04.2018 | B2 | JP2015523307 | 13.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3992161 | ![]() | 08.06.2022 | A3 | EP3992161 | 04.05.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP21168413 | 28.05.2013 | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | EP13727766 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3919454 | ![]() | 01.11.2023 | B1 | EP3919454 | 08.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | EP13727766 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2855382 | ![]() | 26.05.2021 | B1 | EP2855382 | 08.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106904827 | ![]() | 30.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201380027920 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104718167B | ![]() | 03.05.2017 | B | CN104718167 | 17.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4008694 | ![]() | 08.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21168413 | 28.05.2013 | WO2013US42840 | 28.05.2013 | EP13727766 | 28.05.2013 | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013181134 | ![]() | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6533551B | ![]() | 19.06.2019 | B2 | JP2017122048 | 13.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202013012919U | 24.01.2022 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202013012920U | 24.01.2022 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI599549B | 21.09.2017 | B | TW201400430 | 01.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI613175B | 01.02.2018 | B | TW201720774 | 16.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI650297B | 11.02.2019 | B | TW201825423 | 16.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI694977B | 01.06.2020 | B | TW201927714 | 16.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI815009B | 11.09.2023 | B | TW202043165 | 01.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI806197B | 21.06.2023 | B | TW202206395 | 16.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI815197B | 11.09.2023 | B | TW202206396 | 16.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361748981 | 04.01.2013 | US201261653489 | 31.05.2012 | Type | ![]() | EP2855382 | EP3919454 |