EP3992599 - MAGNETOELASTIC TORQUE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breitfeld, Andreas 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Ossmann, Christoph 72768 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
Zegowitz, Michael 72070 Tuebingen / DE | 04 /
Schatz, Frank 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 05 /
Schickle, Sven 72070 Tuebingen / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21204282.4 | 22.10.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | DE202010213671 | 30.10.2020 Original published format: DE102020213671 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992599 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3992599 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/10 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
G01L3/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETOELASTISCHER DREHMOMENTSENSOR | [2022/18] | English: | MAGNETOELASTIC TORQUE SENSOR | [2022/18] | French: | CAPTEUR MAGNÉTO-ÉLASTIQUE DE COUPLE DE ROTATION | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 04.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 17.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO02068922 (FAST TECHNOLOGY AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 3 - line 9; figures 1-6b * * page 5, line 22 - page 12, line 10 * [Y] 2,3,7,8 [I] 4-6,9-12; | [Y]EP3232172 (NCTE AG [DE]) [Y] 2,3,7,8 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016]; figure 2 ** paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * | Examination | EP3708988 |