EP3967120 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRESCRIPTIVE SEED TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inflexion Point Technologies, LLC 4010 Bayberry Court Urbandale, Iowa 50322-2170 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Steven P. Urbandale, Iowa 50322-2170 / US | 02 /
IWIG, Nicholas M. Urbandale, Iowa 50322-2170 / US | 03 /
IWIG, Mark M. Urbandale, Iowa 50322-2170 / US | 04 /
PARKS, Pat Urbandale, Iowa 50322-2170 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21204703.9 | 23.06.2015 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967120 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01C1/06, A01C7/20, A01C21/00, // A01C17/00, A01C7/06 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
A01C1/06 (EP,US);
A01C21/005 (EP,US);
A01C7/20 (EP,US);
A01C17/001 (EP);
A01C2001/048 (US);
A01C7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR FLÄCHENSPEZIFISCHE SAATGUTBEHANDLUNG | [2022/11] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRESCRIPTIVE SEED TREATMENT | [2022/11] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SEMENCES PRESCRIPTIF | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 15.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15896510.3 / EP3313168 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3848772 (AANESTAD R, et al); | [XYI]US4356934 (KNAKE RAYMOND P); | [A]WO8808244 (ERLANDS & CO [FI]); | [XYI]US6112679 (BORSTMAYER DARREN [CA], et al); | [A]US6216615 (ROMANS WILLIAM W [US]) |