EP3970660 - HISTORICAL SCAN REFERENCE FOR INTRAORAL SCANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 2820 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SABINA, Michael Campbell, 95008 / US | 02 /
RASOVSKY, Leon Sunnyvale, 94087 / US | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher, et al Venner Shipley LLP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 21204730.2 | 02.06.2017 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | US201615199437 | 30.06.2016 Original published format: US201615199437 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970660 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3970660 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61C9/00, A61C13/00, A61C7/00 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
A61C7/002 (EP,CN,US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/51 (US);
A61C9/0046 (EP,CN,US);
A61C9/0053 (CN,US);
G06T17/00 (CN,US);
G06T7/0012 (CN,US);
G06T7/11 (CN,US);
G06T7/30 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HISTORISCHE SCANREFERENZ FÜR INTRAORALE SCANS | [2022/12] | English: | HISTORICAL SCAN REFERENCE FOR INTRAORAL SCANS | [2022/12] | French: | RÉFÉRENCE D'HISTORIQUE DE BALAYAGE DESTINÉE À DES BALAYAGES INTRABUCCAUX | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 22.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17731358.2 / EP3478217 | Divisional application(s) | EP23215446.8 / EP4309618 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007172112 (PALEY ERIC B [US], et al); | [A]US2016163115 (FURST GILAD [IL]) |