EP4173938 - SYNTHETIC BICYCLE HANDLEBARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trentmann GmbH & Co. KG Niedersachsenstraße 20 49186 Bad Iburg / DE | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trentmann, Frank 49196 BAD LAER / DE | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Weeg, Thomas, et al Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Großhandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21204805.2 | 26.10.2021 | [2023/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173938 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62K21/12, B62K19/16, B62K19/40, // B62J45/20, B62J50/22 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B62K21/12 (EP);
B62K19/16 (EP);
B62K19/40 (EP);
B62J45/20 (EP);
B62J50/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRRADLENKER AUS KUNSTSTOFF | [2023/18] | English: | SYNTHETIC BICYCLE HANDLEBARS | [2023/18] | French: | GUIDON DE BICYCLETTE EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/14] | 24.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5782139 (FRAIMAN PETER G [US]) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [XAI]WO0168441 (SRAM CORP [US]) [X] 1,6-9 * abstract * [A] 2,4,5 [I] 3; | [IA]US2007151403 (ANDREWS MARK [US], et al) [I] 1-3,7,8 * abstract * [A] 4-6,9; | [IA]US2011219909 (GALSTAD RYAN [US], et al) [I] 1-4,8 * abstract * [A] 5-7,9; | [IA]US9862450 (MEGGIOLAN MARIO [IT]) [I] 1-3,9 * abstract * [A] 4-8; | [IA]WO2020146038 (MONTEZ CARLA MARIE [US]) [I] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * [A] 5 | by applicant | EP2829465 |