Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4020079 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202111060938 EP21205010 US202117304977



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11800055Global Dossier 24.10.2023B2
US2022201243 23.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202117304977 29.06.2021
US202063130285 23.12.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN114666529Global Dossier 24.06.2022A
Priority number Date
US202117304977 29.06.2021
US202063130285 23.12.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4020079Global Dossier 29.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202117304977 29.06.2021
US202063130285 23.12.2020