EP4175123 - ROTOR FOR A DYNAMOELECTRIC ROTARY MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knauff, Axel 97702 Münnerstadt / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Johannes 97218 Gerbrunn / DE | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21205055.3 | 27.10.2021 | [2023/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175123 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/26, H02K17/16 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
H02K1/265 (EP,US);
H02K17/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTOR FÜR EINE DYNAMOELEKTRISCHE ROTATORISCHE MASCHINE | [2023/18] | English: | ROTOR FOR A DYNAMOELECTRIC ROTARY MACHINE | [2023/18] | French: | ROTOR POUR UNE MACHINE TOURNANTE DYNAMOÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/14] | 24.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2591537 (BRUSA ELEKTRONIK AG [CH]); | [Y]US2021028675 (KOERNER OLAF [DE], et al) |