blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4173880

EP4173880 - A MONITORING CIRCUIT FOR MONITORING OF A PROTECTIVE EARTH CONNECTION IN A VEHICLE CHARGING INTERFACE OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2023
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.03.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[2023/18]
Inventor(s)01 / SANDGREN, Victor
416 78 Göteborg / SE
02 / GU, Jingxu
442 39 Kungälv / SE
03 / ÖHMAN, Mikaela
414 81 Göteborg / SE
 [2023/18]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[2023/18]
Application number, filing date21205216.128.10.2021
[2023/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4173880
Date:03.05.2023
Language:EN
[2023/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2022
ClassificationIPC:B60L53/18, B60L3/04, B60L3/00
[2023/18]
CPC:
B60L53/18 (EP,US); B60L53/62 (US); B60L3/0069 (EP);
B60L3/04 (EP); B60L2270/20 (US); Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP); Y02T90/12 (EP); Y02T90/16 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/43]
Former [2023/18]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSSCHALTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER SCHÜTZENDEN MASSEVERBINDUNG IN EINER FAHRZEUGLADESCHNITTSTELLE EINES FAHRZEUGS[2023/18]
English:A MONITORING CIRCUIT FOR MONITORING OF A PROTECTIVE EARTH CONNECTION IN A VEHICLE CHARGING INTERFACE OF A VEHICLE[2023/18]
French:CIRCUIT DE SURVEILLANCE D'UNE CONNEXION À LA TERRE DE PROTECTION DANS UNE INTERFACE DE CHARGEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE[2023/18]
Examination procedure15.09.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2023Examination requested  [2023/43]
15.09.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]KR20170094869  (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *;
 [A]KR20180092093  (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2019184849  (LIM MYUNG KEUN [KR]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0041] - [0 49] - [0096] * * figures 1-10 *;
 [XI]EP3564059  (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [X] 1,5,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0031] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-4,6,7;
 [A]US2020079233  (KIM YANG HYUN [KR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0001] - [0131] * * figures 1-13 *;
 [A]KR20200092624  (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.