EP4173701 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING METAL-CONTAINING SPHERICAL POROUS CARBON PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Berlin Strasse des 17. Juni 135 10623 Berlin / DE | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernsmeier, Denis 10709 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Krähnert, Ralph 13469 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Paul, Benjamin 12439 Berlin / DE | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21205514.9 | 29.10.2021 | [2023/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173701 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/18, C01B32/05, C09D11/037, H01M4/62 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B01J21/18 (EP);
B01J23/42 (EP);
B01J23/462 (EP);
B01J35/33 (EP);
B01J35/40 (EP);
B01J35/647 (EP);
C01B32/05 (EP);
C09D11/037 (EP);
H01M4/9041 (EP);
H01M4/9083 (EP);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/60 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSMETHODE METALLHALTIGER SPHÄRISCH PORÖSER KOHLENSTOFFPARTIKEL | [2023/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING METAL-CONTAINING SPHERICAL POROUS CARBON PARTICLES | [2023/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PARTICULE DE CARBONE POREUSE SPHÉRIQUE MÉTALLIQUE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/15] | 27.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2009304570 (KIM SANG HO [KR], et al); | [XDY]US2011082024 (LIU HANSAN [CA], et al); | by applicant | US5580492 | US6531304 | US2009304570 | US2011082024 | US2013183511 | CN103663410 | EP3363538 | WO2018150047 |