Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
20.12.2022 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.04.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
22.04.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
02.11.2021 | Change - representative |